Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB834 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Estes S.B. No. 834
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 1; April 10, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain grand juror information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Article 19.42, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), information
 collected by the court, court personnel, or prosecuting attorney
 during the grand jury selection process about a person who serves as
 a grand juror, including the person's name, home address, home
 telephone number, social security number, driver's license number,
 and other personal information, is confidential and may not be
 disclosed by the court, court personnel, or prosecuting attorney.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *