House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |