Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB844 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 844
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 March 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to unemployment compensation eligibility and chargebacks
 regarding certain persons who leave work to attend training.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (e), Section 204.022, Labor Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  Benefits may not be charged to the account of an
 employer, regardless of whether the liability for the chargeback
 arises in the employee's current benefit year or in a subsequent
 benefit year, if the employee's last separation from the employer's
 employment before the employee's benefit year was or would have
 been excepted from disqualification under Section 207.023(b)(2) or
 207.045(j) [207.052(b)].
 SECTION 2.  Section 207.045, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  An individual is not disqualified for benefits under
 this section if:
 (1)  the individual left the individual's last work to
 attend commission-approved training under Section 207.022; and
 (2)  the individual's last work did not constitute
 suitable work for the individual, as determined under Section
 207.008.
 SECTION 3.  Section 207.052, Labor Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a claim for unemployment compensation benefits filed with the Texas
 Workforce Commission on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 claim filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the claim was filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *