Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate 2013 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR11

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 6, 2013, and ending on Monday, February 11, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR12

Designating pecan pie as the official State Pie of Texas.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR13

Declaring the City of Canton to be the Walking Capital of Texas.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR14

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 13, 2013, and ending on Monday, February 18, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15

Urging Congress to enact comprehensive immigration reform.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 20, 2013, and ending on Monday, February 25, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR17

Urging Congress to restore the presumption of a service connection for Agent Orange exposure to United States Navy and United States Air Force veterans who served on the inland waterways, in the territorial waters, and in the airspace of the Republic of Vietnam and to institute a presumption of connection to employment for civilians exposed to Agent Orange in their workplaces.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR18

Recognizing the annual Small Town Christmas celebration in the City of Bellville as the Official Small Town Christmas Event of Texas.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR19

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 27, 2013, and ending on Monday, March 4, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR2

Urging the United States Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification an amendment to the United States Constitution that overturns Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission, establishing that the spending of money to influence elections shall not be construed as speech under the First Amendment, and clarifying that only natural persons are protected by constitutional rights.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Designating the first week of May as Texas Bison Week for a 10-year period beginning in 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Recognizing November 4-8, 2013, and November 3-7, 2014, as Municipal Courts Week.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 6, 2013, and ending on Monday, March 11, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Rejecting unlimited submission to the current administration and Congress, reaffirming the sovereignty of our state, and opposing taxes imposed on the citizens of Texas by the passage of the Affordable Care Act.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Requesting the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives to provide for a joint interim legislative study regarding the development and potential economic impact of a cruise industry on the Texas coast between Calhoun and Cameron Counties.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records