House | 08/05/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
E | 07/18/2013 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 07/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 184 | |
E | 07/15/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 07/15/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 51 | |
House | 07/15/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 137 | |
House | 07/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 169 | |
House | 07/15/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 49 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 48 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 46 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 46 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 46 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 46 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 43 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA20 Davis | Journal Page: 42 |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 42 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 26 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Point of order | Journal Page: 26 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 26 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 43 | |
Senate | 07/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 07/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 23 | |
Senate | 07/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 07/10/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 12 | |
Senate | 07/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 12 | |
Senate | 07/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 07/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 114 | |
House | 07/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 63 | |
House | 07/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#29 | Journal Page: 63 |
House | 07/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 63 | |
House | 07/10/2013 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 63 | |
House | 07/10/2013 | Amendment tabled | 1-McClendon | Journal Page: 52 |
House | 07/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 52 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 48 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#26 | Journal Page: 47 |
House | 07/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 47 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | 26-S. King | Journal Page: 47 |
House | 07/09/2013 | Amendment tabled | 25-Herrero | Journal Page: 46 |
House | 07/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 46 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 39 |
House | 07/09/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | 22-Dutton | Journal Page: 38 |
House | 07/09/2013 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 23 |
House | 07/09/2013 | Appeal dismissed | Journal Page: 21 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Ruling appealed | Journal Page: 21 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 11 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 49 | |
House | 07/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/01/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 5 | |
House | 07/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 5 | |
House | 06/28/2013 | Filed |