Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 544
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 544
|
House
|
02/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|