Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1112 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1112
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 22, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 2; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1112 By:  Lucio


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CampbellX
 BurtonX
 BirdwellX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 LucioX
 RodríguezX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to projects that a defense adjustment management authority
 may conduct.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 375.303, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 375.303.  DEFINITION [DEFINITIONS]. In this
 subchapter, "authority"[:
 [(1)  "Authority"] means a defense adjustment
 management authority created under this subchapter.
 [(2)     "Eligible project" means a program authorized by
 Section 379A.051 and a project as defined by Section 501.002 and
 Sections     505.151-505.156.     Notwithstanding this definition,
 seeking a charter for or operating an open-enrollment charter
 school authorized by Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Education Code,
 shall not be an eligible project.]
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter O, Chapter 375, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 375.3035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 375.3035.  ELIGIBLE PROJECTS. (a) In this subchapter,
 eligible projects include only a:
 (1)  program authorized by Section 379A.051;
 (2)  project as defined by Section 501.002 and
 Sections  505.151-505.156;
 (3)  job training program for jobs in the health care,
 technology, or oil and gas industries; or
 (4)  project that relates to a public purpose of the
 district for which the authority receives a grant through a
 competitive grant program administered by the federal government or
 this state, including a program administered by the Parks and
 Wildlife Department, the Texas Department of Transportation, or the
 Texas Workforce Commission.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), in this subchapter,
 seeking a charter for or operating an open-enrollment charter
 school authorized by Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Education Code, is
 not an eligible project.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *