E
|
06/01/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3903
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1472
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|