Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1415 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1415
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishment or use of cemeteries in certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (h), Section 711.008, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by Chapter 367 (S.B. 131), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is redesignated as Subsection
 (i), Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, and amended to read as
 follows:
 (i) [(h)]  A [Not later than September 1, 2014, a] person may
 file a written application with the governing body of a
 municipality to establish or use a cemetery located inside the
 boundaries of the municipality.  The municipality by ordinance
 shall prescribe the information to be included in the
 application.  The governing body by ordinance may authorize the
 establishment or use of a cemetery located inside the boundaries of
 the municipality if the municipality determines and states in the
 ordinance that the establishment or use of the cemetery does not
 adversely affect public health, safety, and welfare.  This
 subsection applies only to a municipality that:
 (1)  is located in three or more counties;
 (2)  has a population of 18,000 or more; and
 (3)  does not have a cemetery within its boundaries,
 other than a family cemetery.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *