1 | | - | By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1415 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1415 |
---|
19 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
20 | 5 | | relating to establishment or use of cemeteries in certain |
---|
21 | 6 | | municipalities. |
---|
22 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
23 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (h), Section 711.008, Health and |
---|
24 | 9 | | Safety Code, as added by Chapter 367 (S.B. 131), Acts of the 82nd |
---|
25 | 10 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is redesignated as Subsection |
---|
26 | 11 | | (i), Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, and amended to read as |
---|
27 | 12 | | follows: |
---|
28 | 13 | | (i) [(h)] A [Not later than September 1, 2014, a] person may |
---|
29 | 14 | | file a written application with the governing body of a |
---|
30 | 15 | | municipality to establish or use a cemetery located inside the |
---|
31 | 16 | | boundaries of the municipality. The municipality by ordinance |
---|
32 | 17 | | shall prescribe the information to be included in the |
---|
33 | 18 | | application. The governing body by ordinance may authorize the |
---|
34 | 19 | | establishment or use of a cemetery located inside the boundaries of |
---|
35 | 20 | | the municipality if the municipality determines and states in the |
---|
36 | 21 | | ordinance that the establishment or use of the cemetery does not |
---|
37 | 22 | | adversely affect public health, safety, and welfare. This |
---|
38 | 23 | | subsection applies only to a municipality that: |
---|
39 | 24 | | (1) is located in three or more counties; |
---|
40 | 25 | | (2) has a population of 18,000 or more; and |
---|
41 | 26 | | (3) does not have a cemetery within its boundaries, |
---|
42 | 27 | | other than a family cemetery. |
---|
43 | 28 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
44 | 29 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
45 | 30 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
46 | 31 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
47 | 32 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
48 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 33 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 35 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1415 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 36 | + | 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 37 | + | voting. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 40 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1415 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 41 | + | 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 42 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 44 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Date |
---|
| 46 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 47 | + | Governor |
---|