House | 05/08/2015 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 2959 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2934 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#829 | Journal Page: 2934 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2934 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amended | 3-Pickett | Journal Page: 2933 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2932 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 248 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 248 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |