E | 05/23/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4468 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3263 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | RV#186 | Journal Page: 1454 |
House | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1401 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1401 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1062 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 02/18/2015 | Filed |