Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1606 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1606
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
3- April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 5, 2015, reported
5- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent
6- to printer.)
1+H.B. No. 1606
72
83
9- COMMITTEE VOTE
10- YeaNayAbsentPNV
11- FraserX
12- EstesX
13- BirdwellX
14- HallX
15- HancockX
16- HinojosaX
17- LucioX
18- NicholsX
19- SeligerX
20- UrestiX
21- ZaffiriniX
22- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
234 AN ACT
245 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Workforce
256 Investment Council, including assumption of the duties of the Texas
267 Skill Standards Board.
278 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
289 SECTION 1. Section 2308.005, Government Code, is amended to
2910 read as follows:
3011 Sec. 2308.005. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas
3112 Workforce Investment Council is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas
3213 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
3314 chapter, the council is abolished September 1, 2027 [2015]. The
3415 council shall be reviewed during the period in which the Texas
3516 Workforce Commission is reviewed.
3617 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
3718 amended by adding Section 2308.109 to read as follows:
3819 Sec. 2308.109. DUTY TO DEVELOP SKILL STANDARDS. (a) The
3920 council shall provide advice to the governor and the legislature on
4021 the development of a statewide system of industry-defined and
4122 industry-recognized skill standards and credentials for all major
4223 skilled occupations that:
4324 (1) provide strong employment and earnings
4425 opportunities in this state; and
4526 (2) require less than a baccalaureate degree.
4627 (b) The council shall:
4728 (1) validate and recognize nationally established
4829 skill standards to guide curriculum development, training,
4930 assessment, and certification of workforce skills;
5031 (2) convene industry groups to develop skill standards
5132 and certification procedures for industries and occupations in
5233 which standards have not been established or adopted and recognize
5334 the skill standards and certification procedures;
5435 (3) review the standards developed by other states and
5536 foreign countries and enter into agreements for mutual recognition
5637 of standards and credentials to enhance portability of skills; and
5738 (4) promote the use of standards and credentials among
5839 employers.
5940 (c) The council shall:
6041 (1) report on the council's duties under this section
6142 to the governor; and
6243 (2) provide annual reports on the council's duties
6344 under this section to the governor, the division, and the
6445 legislature.
6546 SECTION 3. Subchapter H, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
6647 repealed.
6748 SECTION 4. The Texas Skill Standards Board is abolished.
6849 All powers and duties of the Texas Skill Standards Board are
6950 transferred to the Texas Workforce Investment Council.
7051 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
71- * * * * *
52+ ______________________________ ______________________________
53+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
54+ I certify that H.B. No. 1606 was passed by the House on April
55+ 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 2 present, not
56+ voting.
57+ ______________________________
58+ Chief Clerk of the House
59+ I certify that H.B. No. 1606 was passed by the Senate on May
60+ 12, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
61+ ______________________________
62+ Secretary of the Senate
63+ APPROVED: _____________________
64+ Date
65+ _____________________
66+ Governor