Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1606 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1606
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 5, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 FraserX
 EstesX
 BirdwellX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HinojosaX
 LucioX
 NicholsX
 SeligerX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Workforce
 Investment Council, including assumption of the duties of the Texas
 Skill Standards Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2308.005, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2308.005.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas
 Workforce Investment Council is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas
 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the council is abolished September 1, 2027 [2015].  The
 council shall be reviewed during the period in which the Texas
 Workforce Commission is reviewed.
 SECTION 2.   Subchapter C, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2308.109 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2308.109.  DUTY TO DEVELOP SKILL STANDARDS.  (a) The
 council shall provide advice to the governor and the legislature on
 the development of a statewide system of industry-defined and
 industry-recognized skill standards and credentials for all major
 skilled occupations that:
 (1)  provide strong employment and earnings
 opportunities in this state; and
 (2)  require less than a baccalaureate degree.
 (b)  The council shall:
 (1)  validate and recognize nationally established
 skill standards to guide curriculum development, training,
 assessment, and certification of workforce skills;
 (2)  convene industry groups to develop skill standards
 and certification procedures for industries and occupations in
 which standards have not been established or adopted and recognize
 the skill standards and certification procedures;
 (3)  review the standards developed by other states and
 foreign countries and enter into agreements for mutual recognition
 of standards and credentials to enhance portability of skills; and
 (4)  promote the use of standards and credentials among
 employers.
 (c)  The council shall:
 (1)  report on the council's duties under this section
 to the governor; and
 (2)  provide annual reports on the council's duties
 under this section to the governor, the division, and the
 legislature.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter H, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Skill Standards Board is abolished.
 All powers and duties of the Texas Skill Standards Board are
 transferred to the Texas Workforce Investment Council.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *