E | 06/17/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5207 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5212 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 959 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | RV#240 | Journal Page: 1607 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1571 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 595 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 595 | |
House | 02/18/2015 | Filed |