Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1617 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1617
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain real property transactions
 involving the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Subject to Subsections (b) and (c) of this
 section, the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas may
 convey the real property described by Section 2 of this Act to the
 First United Pentecostal Church, Center, Texas, in exchange for the
 real property described by Section 3 of this Act conveyed by the
 First United Pentecostal Church to the Department of Public Safety
 of the State of Texas.
 (b)  The real property described by Section 2 of this Act may
 not be conveyed by the Department of Public Safety of the State of
 Texas to the First United Pentecostal Church unless the fair market
 value of the real property described by Section 3 of this Act is
 equal to or greater than the fair market value of the real property
 described by Section 2 of this Act. The fair market value of the
 real property must be established by an independent appraisal
 obtained by the asset management division of the General Land
 Office.
 (c)  In connection with the conveyance of the real property
 described by Section 2 of this Act, the state shall reserve:
 (1)  the state's interest in all oil, gas, and other
 minerals in and under the real property described by Section 2 of
 this Act;
 (2)  the state's right to remove from the real property
 described by Section 2 of this Act any oil, gas, and other minerals
 in and under the real property; and
 (3)  the state's right to grant a lease held by the
 state before a conveyance of the real property described by Section
 2 of this Act relating to the removal of oil, gas, and other
 minerals in and under the real property.
 (d)  The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
 and the First United Pentecostal Church, Center, Texas, shall each
 reimburse the General Land Office for an amount equal to one-half of
 the fees and expenses incurred by the General Land Office in
 connection with each conveyance of real property under this Act.
 (e)  Sections 31.1571, 31.158, and 31.159, Natural Resources
 Code, do not apply to the exchange of real property authorized by
 this Act.
 SECTION 2.  The real property held by the Department of
 Public Safety of the State of Texas is land being situated in Shelby
 County, Texas, and more particularly described as follows:
 BEING 3.167 acres of land, more or less, out of the J. AMASON
 Survey, Abstract No. 10, in Shelby County, Texas, and also being a
 portion of and the same tract as described in a deed to the State of
 Texas acting through the State Highway Commission from Dr. J. M.
 Rogers and wife Cora M. Rogers, dated April 19, 1950, recorded in
 Volume 292, Page 513, Deed Records of Shelby County, Texas; said
 3.167 acres of land, more or less, is more particularly described by
 metes and bounds as follows, to-wit:
 BEGINNING at a junction of the East right of way line of the
 new location of U. S. Highway 96 and the line between the tract
 herein conveyed and a tract owned by L. F. Holder. Said junction
 being N 74 deg. 16 min. E, 61.00 feet from Centerline Station
 2481+39 of said U. S. Highway 96;
 THENCE N 74 deg. 16 min. E, along said Holder line, 226.60
 feet to a point for a corner, said point being the Northwest corner
 of Mrs. Katheryn Walker's 2 acre tract;
 THENCE S 13 deg. 02 min. E, along the West boundary line of
 Mrs. Katheryn Walker and of the Stalling place 446.00 feet to a
 point for a corner, said point being the Southwest corner of the
 Stalling place;
 THENCE S 18 deg. 44 min. W, 175.00 feet along fence to a point
 for corner;
 THENCE S 07 deg. 33 min. W, 81.00 feet along fence to a point
 for a corner on Ewell Samford's North boundary line;
 THENCE N 68 deg. 03 min. W, 154.99 feet along said Samford's
 North line, to a point for a corner on the East right of way line of
 said U. S. Highway 96, said point being S 68 deg. 03 min. E, 75.00
 feet from Centerline Station 2476+18 of said highway;
 THENCE N 10 deg. 54 min. W, 571.5 feet along the East right of
 way line of said Highway to the place of beginning.
 Said tract containing 3.167 acres of land.
 SECTION 3.  The real property held by the First United
 Pentecostal Church is:
 All that certain tract of land situated in Shelby County,
 Texas, in the JESSE AMASON SURVEY, A-10, being all that land
 conveyed from B. H. McCoy & wife, Archie Myrl McCoy to First United
 Pentecostal Church in Center, Texas, Inc. and recorded in Volume
 561 Page 745 of the Deed Records of Shelby County, Texas, and being
 more particularly described as follows.
 Note: in the following description
 Bearings refer to Grid North of the Texas Coordinate System of 1983
 (Central Zone 4203).
 BEGINNING at a 5/8" Iron Rod set with cap stamped "FSE
 ENGINEERING CENTER, TX" from which a Concrete Right-of-Way marker
 bears S 28° 16' 09" E a distance of 466.04 feet, said 5/8" Iron Rod
 also being the southwest corner of this property;
 THENCE N 14° 21' 20" W with east right-of-way of U.S. Highway
 96 a distance of 400.00 feet to a 5/8" Iron Rod set with cap stamped
 "FSE ENGINEERING CENTER, TX";
 THENCE N 71° 36' 30" E with the south line of the SECOND TRACT
 conveyed to Lowell C. Hufferd and recorded in Volume 948 Page 608 of
 the Official Public Records of Shelby County, Texas, at 308.20 feet
 pass a 5/8" Iron Rod set for reference with cap stamped "FSE
 ENGINEERING CENTER, TX" and at a total distance of 324.18 feet to a
 point for corner in the centerline of County Road 2205;
 THENCE S 19° 29' 22" E with the centerline of County Road 2205
 a distance of 300.00 feet to a point for corner from which a 5/8"
 Iron Rod set for reference with cap stamped "FSE ENGINEERING
 CENTER, TX" bears S 56° 08' 40" W a distance of 30.29 feet;
 THENCE S 56° 08' 40" W with the north line of a called 0.41
 acre tract conveyed to Harold Bennet and recorded in Volume 1080
 Page 103 of the Official Public Records of Shelby County, Texas, and
 the north line of a called 3.5108 acre tract conveyed to Thomas
 Howard and recorded in Volume 800 Page 652 of the Real Property
 Records of Shelby County, Texas, a distance of 371.53 feet to the
 Point of Beginning being 2.724 acres more or less.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *