Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1617 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1617
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
3- May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4- Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1617
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to authorizing certain real property transactions
126 involving the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. (a) Subject to Subsections (b) and (c) of this
159 section, the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas may
1610 convey the real property described by Section 2 of this Act to the
1711 First United Pentecostal Church, Center, Texas, in exchange for the
1812 real property described by Section 3 of this Act conveyed by the
1913 First United Pentecostal Church to the Department of Public Safety
2014 of the State of Texas.
2115 (b) The real property described by Section 2 of this Act may
2216 not be conveyed by the Department of Public Safety of the State of
2317 Texas to the First United Pentecostal Church unless the fair market
2418 value of the real property described by Section 3 of this Act is
2519 equal to or greater than the fair market value of the real property
2620 described by Section 2 of this Act. The fair market value of the
2721 real property must be established by an independent appraisal
2822 obtained by the asset management division of the General Land
2923 Office.
3024 (c) In connection with the conveyance of the real property
3125 described by Section 2 of this Act, the state shall reserve:
3226 (1) the state's interest in all oil, gas, and other
3327 minerals in and under the real property described by Section 2 of
3428 this Act;
3529 (2) the state's right to remove from the real property
3630 described by Section 2 of this Act any oil, gas, and other minerals
3731 in and under the real property; and
3832 (3) the state's right to grant a lease held by the
3933 state before a conveyance of the real property described by Section
4034 2 of this Act relating to the removal of oil, gas, and other
4135 minerals in and under the real property.
4236 (d) The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
4337 and the First United Pentecostal Church, Center, Texas, shall each
4438 reimburse the General Land Office for an amount equal to one-half of
4539 the fees and expenses incurred by the General Land Office in
4640 connection with each conveyance of real property under this Act.
4741 (e) Sections 31.1571, 31.158, and 31.159, Natural Resources
4842 Code, do not apply to the exchange of real property authorized by
4943 this Act.
5044 SECTION 2. The real property held by the Department of
5145 Public Safety of the State of Texas is land being situated in Shelby
5246 County, Texas, and more particularly described as follows:
5347 BEING 3.167 acres of land, more or less, out of the J. AMASON
5448 Survey, Abstract No. 10, in Shelby County, Texas, and also being a
5549 portion of and the same tract as described in a deed to the State of
5650 Texas acting through the State Highway Commission from Dr. J. M.
5751 Rogers and wife Cora M. Rogers, dated April 19, 1950, recorded in
5852 Volume 292, Page 513, Deed Records of Shelby County, Texas; said
5953 3.167 acres of land, more or less, is more particularly described by
6054 metes and bounds as follows, to-wit:
6155 BEGINNING at a junction of the East right of way line of the
6256 new location of U. S. Highway 96 and the line between the tract
6357 herein conveyed and a tract owned by L. F. Holder. Said junction
6458 being N 74 deg. 16 min. E, 61.00 feet from Centerline Station
6559 2481+39 of said U. S. Highway 96;
6660 THENCE N 74 deg. 16 min. E, along said Holder line, 226.60
6761 feet to a point for a corner, said point being the Northwest corner
6862 of Mrs. Katheryn Walker's 2 acre tract;
6963 THENCE S 13 deg. 02 min. E, along the West boundary line of
7064 Mrs. Katheryn Walker and of the Stalling place 446.00 feet to a
7165 point for a corner, said point being the Southwest corner of the
7266 Stalling place;
7367 THENCE S 18 deg. 44 min. W, 175.00 feet along fence to a point
7468 for corner;
7569 THENCE S 07 deg. 33 min. W, 81.00 feet along fence to a point
7670 for a corner on Ewell Samford's North boundary line;
7771 THENCE N 68 deg. 03 min. W, 154.99 feet along said Samford's
7872 North line, to a point for a corner on the East right of way line of
7973 said U. S. Highway 96, said point being S 68 deg. 03 min. E, 75.00
8074 feet from Centerline Station 2476+18 of said highway;
8175 THENCE N 10 deg. 54 min. W, 571.5 feet along the East right of
8276 way line of said Highway to the place of beginning.
8377 Said tract containing 3.167 acres of land.
8478 SECTION 3. The real property held by the First United
8579 Pentecostal Church is:
8680 All that certain tract of land situated in Shelby County,
8781 Texas, in the JESSE AMASON SURVEY, A-10, being all that land
8882 conveyed from B. H. McCoy & wife, Archie Myrl McCoy to First United
8983 Pentecostal Church in Center, Texas, Inc. and recorded in Volume
9084 561 Page 745 of the Deed Records of Shelby County, Texas, and being
9185 more particularly described as follows.
9286 Note: in the following description
9387 Bearings refer to Grid North of the Texas Coordinate System of 1983
9488 (Central Zone 4203).
9589 BEGINNING at a 5/8" Iron Rod set with cap stamped "FSE
9690 ENGINEERING CENTER, TX" from which a Concrete Right-of-Way marker
9791 bears S 28° 16' 09" E a distance of 466.04 feet, said 5/8" Iron Rod
9892 also being the southwest corner of this property;
9993 THENCE N 14° 21' 20" W with east right-of-way of U.S. Highway
10094 96 a distance of 400.00 feet to a 5/8" Iron Rod set with cap stamped
10195 "FSE ENGINEERING CENTER, TX";
10296 THENCE N 71° 36' 30" E with the south line of the SECOND TRACT
10397 conveyed to Lowell C. Hufferd and recorded in Volume 948 Page 608 of
10498 the Official Public Records of Shelby County, Texas, at 308.20 feet
10599 pass a 5/8" Iron Rod set for reference with cap stamped "FSE
106100 ENGINEERING CENTER, TX" and at a total distance of 324.18 feet to a
107101 point for corner in the centerline of County Road 2205;
108102 THENCE S 19° 29' 22" E with the centerline of County Road 2205
109103 a distance of 300.00 feet to a point for corner from which a 5/8"
110104 Iron Rod set for reference with cap stamped "FSE ENGINEERING
111105 CENTER, TX" bears S 56° 08' 40" W a distance of 30.29 feet;
112106 THENCE S 56° 08' 40" W with the north line of a called 0.41
113107 acre tract conveyed to Harold Bennet and recorded in Volume 1080
114108 Page 103 of the Official Public Records of Shelby County, Texas, and
115109 the north line of a called 3.5108 acre tract conveyed to Thomas
116110 Howard and recorded in Volume 800 Page 652 of the Real Property
117111 Records of Shelby County, Texas, a distance of 371.53 feet to the
118112 Point of Beginning being 2.724 acres more or less.
119113 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
120114 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
121115 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
122116 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
123117 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
124- * * * * *
118+ ______________________________ ______________________________
119+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
120+ I certify that H.B. No. 1617 was passed by the House on April
121+ 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 2 present, not
122+ voting.
123+ ______________________________
124+ Chief Clerk of the House
125+ I certify that H.B. No. 1617 was passed by the Senate on May
126+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
127+ ______________________________
128+ Secretary of the Senate
129+ APPROVED: _____________________
130+ Date
131+ _____________________
132+ Governor