E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2158
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#455
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 598
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 598
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|