Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1661 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1661
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KolkhorstX
 CampbellX
 EstesX
 PerryX
 RodríguezX
 TaylorofCollinX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Medicaid billing for the services of substitute
 dentists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.076.  SUBSTITUTE DENTISTS. To the extent allowed by
 federal law, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules ensuring that the same
 standards applying to a physician who bills the medical assistance
 program for services provided by a substitute physician apply also
 to a dentist who bills the medical assistance program for services
 provided by a substitute dentist.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *