E | 06/19/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5571 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4972 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1310 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#526 | Journal Page: 2355 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2355 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2355 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2301 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 651 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 651 | |
House | 02/20/2015 | Filed |