E | 06/10/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/10/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4083 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1462 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#802 | Journal Page: 2884 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2884 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amended | 1-Mrquez | Journal Page: 2763 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2064 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Filed |