Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1790 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Márquez, Nevárez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1790
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 18, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to job performance on behalf of a fire fighter or police
 officer who is recovering from an off-duty injury.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 143.073(d), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  If a fire fighter or police officer is temporarily
 disabled by an injury or illness that is not related to the person's
 line of duty, the person may:
 (1)  use all sick leave, vacation time, and other
 accumulated time before the person is placed on temporary leave; or
 (2)  have another fire fighter or police officer
 volunteer to do the person's work while the person is temporarily
 disabled by the injury or illness.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *