E
|
05/13/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
E
|
05/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3134
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3107
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1246
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#181
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 249
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 249
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|