Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB181 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bell, Krause (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 181
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information printed by school districts on high school
 diplomas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 28.025(c-1), (c-5), and (e-1),
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A student may earn an endorsement on the student's
 [diploma and] transcript by successfully completing curriculum
 requirements for that endorsement adopted by the State Board of
 Education by rule. The State Board of Education by rule shall
 provide students with multiple options for earning each
 endorsement, including, to the greatest extent possible, coherent
 sequences of courses.  The State Board of Education by rule must
 permit a student to enroll in courses under more than one
 endorsement curriculum before the student's junior year.  An
 endorsement under this subsection may be earned in any of the
 following categories:
 (1)  science, technology, engineering, and mathematics
 (STEM), which includes courses directly related to science,
 including environmental science, technology, including computer
 science, engineering, and advanced mathematics;
 (2)  business and industry, which includes courses
 directly related to database management, information technology,
 communications, accounting, finance, marketing, graphic design,
 architecture, construction, welding, logistics, automotive
 technology, agricultural science, and heating, ventilation, and
 air conditioning;
 (3)  public services, which includes courses directly
 related to health sciences and occupations, education and training,
 law enforcement, and culinary arts and hospitality;
 (4)  arts and humanities, which includes courses
 directly related to political science, world languages, cultural
 studies, English literature, history, and fine arts; and
 (5)  multidisciplinary studies, which allows a student
 to:
 (A)  select courses from the curriculum of each
 endorsement area described by Subdivisions (1) through (4); and
 (B)  earn credits in a variety of advanced courses
 from multiple content areas sufficient to complete the
 distinguished level of achievement under the foundation high school
 program.
 (c-5)  A student may earn a performance acknowledgment on the
 student's [diploma and] transcript by satisfying the requirements
 for that acknowledgment adopted by the State Board of Education by
 rule. An acknowledgment under this subsection may be earned:
 (1)  for outstanding performance:
 (A)  in a dual credit course;
 (B)  in bilingualism and biliteracy;
 (C)  on a college advanced placement test or
 international baccalaureate examination; or
 (D)  on the PSAT, the ACT-Plan, the SAT, or the
 ACT; or
 (2)  for earning a nationally or internationally
 recognized business or industry certification or license.
 (e-1)  A school district shall clearly indicate a
 distinguished level of achievement under the foundation high school
 program as described by Subsection (b-15), an endorsement described
 by Subsection (c-1), and a performance acknowledgment described by
 Subsection (c-5) on the [diploma and] transcript of a student who
 satisfies the applicable requirements. The State Board of Education
 shall adopt rules as necessary to administer this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with a high school
 diploma issued at the end of the 2014-2015 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *