E | 06/09/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/09/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5207 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5212 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4767 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Record vote | RV#252 | Journal Page: 1641 |
House | 04/17/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1618 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1618 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1062 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Filed |