Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1914 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1914
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the frequency with which the Board of Pardons and
 Paroles considers the eligibility of certain inmates for release on
 parole.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 508.141(g-1), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (g-1)  The month designated under Subsection (g)(1) by the
 parole panel that denied release must begin after the first
 anniversary of the date of the denial and end before the fifth
 anniversary of the date of the denial, unless the inmate is serving
 a sentence for an offense under Section 22.021, Penal Code, or a
 life sentence for a capital felony, in which event the designated
 month must begin after the first anniversary of the date of the
 denial and end before the 10th anniversary of the date of the
 denial.
 SECTION 2.  The Board of Pardons and Paroles shall adopt a
 policy consistent with Section 508.141(g-1), Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, as soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *