Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill November 10, 2014

House Committee Report

Analysis February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 1, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015