Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB194 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 194
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Gold Star
 Mothers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.061.  GOLD STAR MOTHER'S DAY. (a)  The last Sunday
 in September of each year is Gold Star Mother's Day in recognition
 of mothers whose sons and daughters died while serving in the United
 States armed forces.
 (b)  Gold Star Mother's Day shall be regularly observed by
 appropriate ceremonies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *