E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2344
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 634
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 634
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|