Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2035 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2035
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation by certain alcohol-related businesses based
 on the amount of alcohol sold.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 109.57(d), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  This section does not affect the authority of a
 governmental entity to regulate, in a manner as otherwise permitted
 by law, the location of:
 (1)  a massage parlor, nude modeling studio, or other
 sexually oriented business; [or]
 (2)  an establishment that derives 75 percent or more
 of the establishment's gross revenue from the on-premise sale of
 alcoholic beverages; or
 (3)  an establishment that:
 (A)  derives 50 percent or more of the
 establishment's gross revenue from the on-premise sale of alcoholic
 beverages; and
 (B)  is located in a municipality or county, any
 portion of which is located not more than 50 miles from an
 international border.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *