E
|
06/01/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1187
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 809
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#210
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1522
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1522
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 264
|
House
|
02/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 264
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|