Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill November 10, 2014

House Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill April 14, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Enrolled

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill May 19, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2015
Bill March 31, 2015