LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB225
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB225
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB225
Compare Versions
HB225 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB225 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB225 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB225 Comm Sub April 30, 2015
HB225 Engrossed April 14, 2015
HB225 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB225 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB225 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB225 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB225 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB225 Comm Sub April 30, 2015
HB225 Engrossed April 14, 2015
HB225 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB225 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare