Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2278 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2278
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain current and retired associate
 judges to conduct a marriage ceremony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.202(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The following persons are authorized to conduct a
 marriage ceremony:
 (1)  a licensed or ordained Christian minister or
 priest;
 (2)  a Jewish rabbi;
 (3)  a person who is an officer of a religious
 organization and who is authorized by the organization to conduct a
 marriage ceremony;
 (4)  a justice of the supreme court, judge of the court
 of criminal appeals, justice of the courts of appeals, judge of the
 district, county, and probate courts, judge of the county courts at
 law, judge of the courts of domestic relations, judge of the
 juvenile courts, retired justice or judge of those courts, justice
 of the peace, retired justice of the peace, judge of a municipal
 court, retired judge of a municipal court, associate judge of a
 statutory probate court, retired associate judge of a statutory
 probate court, associate judge of a county court at law, retired
 associate judge of a county court at law, or judge or magistrate of
 a federal court of this state; and
 (5)  a retired judge or magistrate of a federal court of
 this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *