Senate | 05/24/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1536 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1536 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1464 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2840 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2820 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2820 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |