Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2302 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Riddle, Rose (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2302
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 24, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2302 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the mandatory dismissal of misdemeanor charges against
 certain defendants determined to be incompetent to stand trial.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 46B.010, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by Chapters 718 (H.B. 748) and 822 (H.B. 2725), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 Art. 46B.010.  MANDATORY DISMISSAL OF MISDEMEANOR
 CHARGES.  If a court orders that a defendant charged with a
 misdemeanor punishable by confinement be committed to a mental
 hospital or other inpatient or residential facility, participate in
 an outpatient treatment program, or be subjected to both inpatient
 and outpatient treatment, and the defendant is not tried before the
 expiration of the maximum period of restoration described by
 Article 46B.0095:
 (1)  on the motion of the attorney representing the
 state, the court shall dismiss the charge; or
 (2)  on the motion of the attorney representing the
 defendant, the court shall:
 (A)  set the matter to be heard not later than the
 10th day after the date of filing of the motion; and
 (B)  dismiss the charge on a finding that the
 defendant was not tried before the expiration of the maximum period
 of restoration.
 SECTION 2.  Article 46B.073(e), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsections (b), (c), and (d) and
 notwithstanding the contents of the applicable order of commitment,
 in a county in which the department operates a jail-based
 restoration of competency pilot program under Article 46B.090, a
 defendant for whom an order is issued under this article committing
 the defendant to a mental health facility or residential care
 facility shall be provided competency restoration services at the
 jail under the pilot program if the service provider at the jail
 determines the defendant will immediately begin to receive
 services. If the service provider at the jail determines the
 defendant will not immediately begin to receive competency
 restoration services, the defendant shall be transferred to the
 appropriate mental health facility or residential care facility as
 provided by the court order. This subsection expires September 1,
 2019 [2017].
 SECTION 3.  Article 46B.090(o), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (o)  This article expires September 1, 2019 [2017].
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act to Article
 46B.010, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies only to a defendant
 with respect to whom any proceeding under Chapter 46B, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, is conducted on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *