1 | 1 | | By: Riddle, Rose (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2302 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
4 | 4 | | Justice; May 24, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 24, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2302 By: Whitmire |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the mandatory dismissal of misdemeanor charges against |
---|
14 | 14 | | certain defendants determined to be incompetent to stand trial. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Article 46B.010, Code of Criminal Procedure, as |
---|
17 | 17 | | amended by Chapters 718 (H.B. 748) and 822 (H.B. 2725), Acts of the |
---|
18 | 18 | | 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted to read as |
---|
19 | 19 | | follows: |
---|
20 | 20 | | Art. 46B.010. MANDATORY DISMISSAL OF MISDEMEANOR |
---|
21 | 21 | | CHARGES. If a court orders that a defendant charged with a |
---|
22 | 22 | | misdemeanor punishable by confinement be committed to a mental |
---|
23 | 23 | | hospital or other inpatient or residential facility, participate in |
---|
24 | 24 | | an outpatient treatment program, or be subjected to both inpatient |
---|
25 | 25 | | and outpatient treatment, and the defendant is not tried before the |
---|
26 | 26 | | expiration of the maximum period of restoration described by |
---|
27 | 27 | | Article 46B.0095: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) on the motion of the attorney representing the |
---|
29 | 29 | | state, the court shall dismiss the charge; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) on the motion of the attorney representing the |
---|
31 | 31 | | defendant, the court shall: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (A) set the matter to be heard not later than the |
---|
33 | 33 | | 10th day after the date of filing of the motion; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (B) dismiss the charge on a finding that the |
---|
35 | 35 | | defendant was not tried before the expiration of the maximum period |
---|
36 | 36 | | of restoration. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Article 46B.073(e), Code of Criminal Procedure, |
---|
38 | 38 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (e) Notwithstanding Subsections (b), (c), and (d) and |
---|
40 | 40 | | notwithstanding the contents of the applicable order of commitment, |
---|
41 | 41 | | in a county in which the department operates a jail-based |
---|
42 | 42 | | restoration of competency pilot program under Article 46B.090, a |
---|
43 | 43 | | defendant for whom an order is issued under this article committing |
---|
44 | 44 | | the defendant to a mental health facility or residential care |
---|
45 | 45 | | facility shall be provided competency restoration services at the |
---|
46 | 46 | | jail under the pilot program if the service provider at the jail |
---|
47 | 47 | | determines the defendant will immediately begin to receive |
---|
48 | 48 | | services. If the service provider at the jail determines the |
---|
49 | 49 | | defendant will not immediately begin to receive competency |
---|
50 | 50 | | restoration services, the defendant shall be transferred to the |
---|
51 | 51 | | appropriate mental health facility or residential care facility as |
---|
52 | 52 | | provided by the court order. This subsection expires September 1, |
---|
53 | 53 | | 2019 [2017]. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 3. Article 46B.090(o), Code of Criminal Procedure, |
---|
55 | 55 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (o) This article expires September 1, 2019 [2017]. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Article |
---|
58 | 58 | | 46B.010, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies only to a defendant |
---|
59 | 59 | | with respect to whom any proceeding under Chapter 46B, Code of |
---|
60 | 60 | | Criminal Procedure, is conducted on or after the effective date of |
---|
61 | 61 | | this Act. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
63 | 63 | | * * * * * |
---|