House | 05/14/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3547 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1843 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |