E | 06/20/2015 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6050 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4083 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1748 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1748 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1748 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1748 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1748 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1748 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1397 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2623 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#680 | Journal Page: 2622 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2622 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2622 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Filed |