Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2466 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Collier, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2466
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
3- May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
4- and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2466
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the creation of a safety reimbursement program for
126 employers participating in the workers' compensation system.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Labor Code, is
159 amended by adding Section 411.1031 to read as follows:
1610 Sec. 411.1031. SAFETY REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM. (a) In this
1711 section:
1812 (1) "Eligible employer" means an employer, other than
1913 this state or a political subdivision of this state subject to
2014 Subtitle C, that has workers' compensation insurance coverage and
2115 that:
2216 (A) employed at least two but not more than 50
2317 employees on each business day during the preceding calendar year;
2418 or
2519 (B) is a type of employer designated as eligible
2620 to participate in the program by the commissioner.
2721 (2) "Program" means the workers' compensation safety
2822 reimbursement program established under this section.
2923 (b) The commissioner shall adopt rules establishing a
3024 safety reimbursement program designed to assist eligible employers
3125 in the creation of safe and healthy workplaces for employees of this
3226 state. The rules must include requirements for eligible employer
3327 applications and appropriate use of allocated funds.
3428 (c) The program shall reimburse an eligible employer for
3529 expenses incurred by the employer to facilitate a safe and healthy
3630 workplace for employees of the employer. Reimbursement under this
3731 section to an eligible employer may not exceed $5,000 per calendar
3832 year. Allowable expenses may include:
3933 (1) physical modifications to the worksite;
4034 (2) safety equipment, devices, and tools;
4135 (3) safety training for employees; and
4236 (4) other measures or equipment necessary to correct
4337 identified safety hazards and protect employees from unsafe working
4438 conditions.
4539 (d) The commissioner by rule shall establish an optional
4640 preauthorization plan for eligible employers that participate in
4741 the program. The plan must require that an eligible employer submit
4842 to the division a proposal in compliance with division rules that
4943 describes the workplace modifications and other changes that the
5044 employer proposes to make to facilitate a safe and healthy
5145 workplace for employees of the employer.
5246 (e) If the division approves an eligible employer's
5347 proposal submitted under Subsection (d), the division shall
5448 guarantee reimbursement of the expenses incurred by the employer in
5549 implementing the modifications and changes approved by the division
5650 unless the division determines that the modifications and changes
5751 differ materially from the employer's proposal. Reimbursement
5852 under this subsection is subject to the limit imposed under
5953 Subsection (c).
6054 (f) From administrative penalties collected by the
6155 division, the commissioner shall annually deposit the first
6256 $100,000 into the general revenue fund of the state treasury to the
6357 credit of the Texas Department of Insurance operating account for
6458 the purposes of funding the program. Money for the program may be
6559 spent by the division, on appropriation by the legislature, only
6660 for the purposes of implementing this section.
6761 (g) An insurance company shall notify eligible employers of
6862 the availability of the program as provided by commissioner rule.
6963 (h) Notwithstanding Subsections (a)-(g), this section may
7064 be implemented only to the extent funds are available.
7165 (i) Not later than December 1, 2018, the commissioner shall
7266 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
7367 house of representatives, and the members of the legislature
7468 regarding:
7569 (1) the implementation of the program;
7670 (2) the results of the program; and
7771 (3) recommendations regarding the continuation of the
7872 program, including any changes necessary to enhance the
7973 effectiveness of the program.
8074 (j) This section expires September 1, 2019.
8175 SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
8276 date of this Act, the commissioner of workers' compensation shall
8377 adopt rules necessary to implement the workers' compensation safety
8478 reimbursement program established under Section 411.1031, Labor
8579 Code, as added by this Act.
8680 (b) The division of workers' compensation of the Texas
8781 Department of Insurance shall implement the workers' compensation
8882 safety reimbursement program established under Section 411.1031,
8983 Labor Code, as added by this Act, beginning January 1, 2016.
9084 (c) An eligible employer may not receive reimbursement
9185 under Section 411.1031, Labor Code, as added by this Act, for costs
9286 incurred before January 1, 2016.
9387 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
94- * * * * *
88+ ______________________________ ______________________________
89+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
90+ I certify that H.B. No. 2466 was passed by the House on May 6,
91+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 99, Nays 42, 2 present, not
92+ voting.
93+ ______________________________
94+ Chief Clerk of the House
95+ I certify that H.B. No. 2466 was passed by the Senate on May
96+ 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 22, Nays 8.
97+ ______________________________
98+ Secretary of the Senate
99+ APPROVED: _____________________
100+ Date
101+ _____________________
102+ Governor