Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2466 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Collier, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2466
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a safety reimbursement program for
 employers participating in the workers' compensation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1031.  SAFETY REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Eligible employer" means an employer, other than
 this state or a political subdivision of this state subject to
 Subtitle C, that has workers' compensation insurance coverage and
 that:
 (A)  employed at least two but not more than 50
 employees on each business day during the preceding calendar year;
 or
 (B)  is a type of employer designated as eligible
 to participate in the program by the commissioner.
 (2)  "Program" means the workers' compensation safety
 reimbursement program established under this section.
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt rules establishing a
 safety reimbursement program designed to assist eligible employers
 in the creation of safe and healthy workplaces for employees of this
 state.  The rules must include requirements for eligible employer
 applications and appropriate use of allocated funds.
 (c)  The program shall reimburse an eligible employer for
 expenses incurred by the employer to facilitate a safe and healthy
 workplace for employees of the employer. Reimbursement under this
 section to an eligible employer may not exceed $5,000 per calendar
 year. Allowable expenses may include:
 (1)  physical modifications to the worksite;
 (2)  safety equipment, devices, and tools;
 (3)  safety training for employees; and
 (4)  other measures or equipment necessary to correct
 identified safety hazards and protect employees from unsafe working
 conditions.
 (d)  The commissioner by rule shall establish an optional
 preauthorization plan for eligible employers that participate in
 the program. The plan must require that an eligible employer submit
 to the division a proposal in compliance with division rules that
 describes the workplace modifications and other changes that the
 employer proposes to make to facilitate a safe and healthy
 workplace for employees of the employer.
 (e)  If the division approves an eligible employer's
 proposal submitted under Subsection (d), the division shall
 guarantee reimbursement of the expenses incurred by the employer in
 implementing the modifications and changes approved by the division
 unless the division determines that the modifications and changes
 differ materially from the employer's proposal.  Reimbursement
 under this subsection is subject to the limit imposed under
 Subsection (c).
 (f)  From administrative penalties collected by the
 division, the commissioner shall annually deposit the first
 $100,000 into the general revenue fund of the state treasury to the
 credit of the Texas Department of Insurance operating account for
 the purposes of funding the program. Money for the program may be
 spent by the division, on appropriation by the legislature, only
 for the purposes of implementing this section.
 (g)  An insurance company shall notify eligible employers of
 the availability of the program as provided by commissioner rule.
 (h)  Notwithstanding Subsections (a)-(g), this section may
 be implemented only to the extent funds are available.
 (i)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the commissioner shall
 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the members of the legislature
 regarding:
 (1)  the implementation of the program;
 (2)  the results of the program; and
 (3)  recommendations regarding the continuation of the
 program, including any changes necessary to enhance the
 effectiveness of the program.
 (j)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the commissioner of workers' compensation shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement the workers' compensation safety
 reimbursement program established under Section 411.1031, Labor
 Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The division of workers' compensation of the Texas
 Department of Insurance shall implement the workers' compensation
 safety reimbursement program established under Section 411.1031,
 Labor Code, as added by this Act, beginning January 1, 2016.
 (c)  An eligible employer may not receive reimbursement
 under Section 411.1031, Labor Code, as added by this Act, for costs
 incurred before January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *