Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1464
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#689
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2608
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 2608
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2607
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 2606
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2606
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/6/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2298
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2298
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/1/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/28/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|