Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2493 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2493
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the self-directed and semi-independent status of the
 State Securities Board; authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 472.001, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 472.001.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER.  This chapter
 applies to:
 (1)  the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy;
 (2)  the Texas Board of Professional Engineers; [and]
 (3)  the Texas Board of Architectural Examiners; and
 (4)  the State Securities Board.
 SECTION 2.  The Securities Act (Article 581-1 et seq.,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes) is amended by adding Sections 44,
 45, 46, and 47 to read as follows:
 Sec. 44.  SELF-DIRECTED AND SEMI-INDEPENDENT STATUS. The
 State Securities Board has self-directed and semi-independent
 status as provided under Chapter 472, Government Code.
 Sec. 45.  REPORT TO BOARD. Periodically, the Commissioner
 shall submit to the members of the Board, as directed by the Board
 members, a report of the receipts and expenditures of the agency.
 Sec. 46.  REFUND OF REGISTRATION FEE. If the Commissioner or
 Board determines that all or part of a registration fee should be
 refunded, the refund shall be made by warrant on the state treasury
 from the fund into which the registration fee was deposited.
 Sec. 47.  REPRESENTATION BY ATTORNEY GENERAL. The attorney
 general may assess and collect from the Commissioner or the Board
 reasonable attorney's fees associated with any legal
 representation requested by the Commissioner and provided by the
 attorney general. Notwithstanding any other law, a requirement that
 the attorney general represent an agency in any litigation does not
 apply to a proceeding under this Act that is governed by Chapter
 2001, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  Subsections D, G, and K, Section 2, The
 Securities Act (Article 581-2, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are
 amended to read as follows:
 D.  Each member of the Board is entitled to reimbursement for
 travel expenses incurred [per diem as set by legislative
 appropriation] for each day that the member engages in the business
 of the Board.
 The Governor shall designate a member of the Board as the
 presiding officer of the Board to serve in that capacity at the will
 of the Governor. A majority of the members shall constitute a quorum
 for the transaction of any business.
 G.  The Board shall appoint a Securities Commissioner who
 serves at the pleasure of the Board and who shall, under the
 supervision of the Board, administer the provisions of this Act.
 The Board shall determine the Commissioner's salary. Each member of
 the Board shall have access to all offices and records under his
 supervision, and the Board, or a majority thereof, may exercise any
 power or perform any act authorized to the [Securities]
 Commissioner by the provisions of this Act.
 K.  The Commissioner shall determine the number of Board
 employees and the employees' salaries. The Commissioner or his
 designee shall develop an intraagency career ladder program, one
 part of which shall be the intraagency posting of all nonentry level
 positions for at least ten (10) days before any public posting. The
 Commissioner or his designee shall develop a system of annual
 performance evaluations based on measurable job tasks. All merit
 pay for Board employees must be based on the system established
 under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Subsection C, Section 2-3, The Securities Act
 (Article 581-2-3, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to
 read as follows:
 C.  A person appointed to the Board is entitled to
 reimbursement[, as provided by the General Appropriations Act,] for
 the travel expenses incurred in attending the training program
 regardless of whether the attendance at the program occurs before
 or after the person qualifies for office.
 SECTION 5.  Subsections A and D, Section 35, The Securities
 Act (Article 581-35, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to
 read as follows:
 A.  The Board shall establish the following fees to produce
 [in amounts so that the aggregate amount that exceeds the amount of
 the fees on September 1, 2002, produces] sufficient revenue to
 cover the costs of administering and enforcing this Act:
 (1)  for the filing of any original, amended, or
 renewal application to sell or dispose of securities[, an amount
 not to exceed $100];
 (2)  for the filing of any original application of a
 dealer or investment adviser or for the submission of a notice
 filing for a federal covered investment adviser[, an amount not to
 exceed $100];
 (3)  for the filing of any renewal application of a
 dealer or investment adviser or for the submission of a renewal
 notice filing for a federal covered investment adviser[, an amount
 not to exceed $100];
 (4)  for the filing of any original application for
 each agent, officer, or investment adviser representative or for
 the submission of a notice filing for each representative of a
 federal covered investment adviser[, an amount not to exceed $100];
 and
 (5)  for the filing of any renewal application for each
 agent, officer, or investment adviser representative or for the
 submission of a renewal notice filing for each representative of a
 federal covered investment adviser[, an amount not to exceed $100].
 D.  A cost incurred by the Board in administering or
 enforcing this Act may be paid only from a fee collected under
 Subsection A of this section.
 SECTION 6.  The following provisions of The Securities Act
 (Article 581-l et seq., Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes) are
 repealed:
 (1)  Subsections J, M, and N, Section 2;
 (2)  Subsection C, Section 35; and
 (3)  Section 36.
 SECTION 7.  Subject to Chapter 472, Government Code, the
 appropriations made by an Act of the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, may be spent by the State Securities Board as the
 Securities Commissioner directs. The board shall repay to the
 general revenue fund the appropriation made to the agency for the
 state fiscal year ending August 31, 2016, not later than that date
 and as funds become available. The board shall repay to the general
 revenue fund the appropriation made to the board for the state
 fiscal year ending August 31, 2017, not later than that date and as
 funds become available.
 SECTION 8.  The transfer of the State Securities Board to
 self-directed and semi-independent status under this Act, and the
 expiration of self-directed and semi-independent status may not act
 to cancel, suspend, or prevent:
 (1)  any debt owed to or by the State Securities Board;
 (2)  any fine, tax, penalty, or obligation of any
 party;
 (3)  any contract or other obligation of any party; or
 (4)  any action taken by the State Securities Board,
 the Securities Commissioner, or the board's employees in the
 administration or enforcement of the agency's duties.
 SECTION 9.  The State Securities Board shall continue to
 have and exercise the powers and duties allocated to the board in
 the board's enabling legislation, except as specifically amended by
 this Act.
 SECTION 10.  Title to or ownership of all supplies,
 materials, records, equipment, books, papers, and furniture used by
 the State Securities Board is transferred to the State Securities
 Board in fee simple. This Act does not affect any property owned by
 the State Securities Board on or before the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 11.  Beginning September 1, 2015, the State
 Securities Board shall pay rent to this state in a reasonable amount
 to be determined by the Texas Facilities Commission for its use and
 occupancy of state-owned office space.
 SECTION 12.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *