Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2493 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2493
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
33 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
44 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
55 vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
66 Click here to see the committee vote
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the self-directed and semi-independent status of the
1212 State Securities Board; authorizing fees.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Section 472.001, Government Code, is amended to
1515 read as follows:
1616 Sec. 472.001. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
1717 applies to:
1818 (1) the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy;
1919 (2) the Texas Board of Professional Engineers; [and]
2020 (3) the Texas Board of Architectural Examiners; and
2121 (4) the State Securities Board.
2222 SECTION 2. The Securities Act (Article 581-1 et seq.,
2323 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes) is amended by adding Sections 44,
2424 45, 46, and 47 to read as follows:
2525 Sec. 44. SELF-DIRECTED AND SEMI-INDEPENDENT STATUS. The
2626 State Securities Board has self-directed and semi-independent
2727 status as provided under Chapter 472, Government Code.
2828 Sec. 45. REPORT TO BOARD. Periodically, the Commissioner
2929 shall submit to the members of the Board, as directed by the Board
3030 members, a report of the receipts and expenditures of the agency.
3131 Sec. 46. REFUND OF REGISTRATION FEE. If the Commissioner or
3232 Board determines that all or part of a registration fee should be
3333 refunded, the refund shall be made by warrant on the state treasury
3434 from the fund into which the registration fee was deposited.
3535 Sec. 47. REPRESENTATION BY ATTORNEY GENERAL. The attorney
3636 general may assess and collect from the Commissioner or the Board
3737 reasonable attorney's fees associated with any legal
3838 representation requested by the Commissioner and provided by the
3939 attorney general. Notwithstanding any other law, a requirement that
4040 the attorney general represent an agency in any litigation does not
4141 apply to a proceeding under this Act that is governed by Chapter
4242 2001, Government Code.
4343 SECTION 3. Subsections D, G, and K, Section 2, The
4444 Securities Act (Article 581-2, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are
4545 amended to read as follows:
4646 D. Each member of the Board is entitled to reimbursement for
4747 travel expenses incurred [per diem as set by legislative
4848 appropriation] for each day that the member engages in the business
4949 of the Board.
5050 The Governor shall designate a member of the Board as the
5151 presiding officer of the Board to serve in that capacity at the will
5252 of the Governor. A majority of the members shall constitute a quorum
5353 for the transaction of any business.
5454 G. The Board shall appoint a Securities Commissioner who
5555 serves at the pleasure of the Board and who shall, under the
5656 supervision of the Board, administer the provisions of this Act.
5757 The Board shall determine the Commissioner's salary. Each member of
5858 the Board shall have access to all offices and records under his
5959 supervision, and the Board, or a majority thereof, may exercise any
6060 power or perform any act authorized to the [Securities]
6161 Commissioner by the provisions of this Act.
6262 K. The Commissioner shall determine the number of Board
6363 employees and the employees' salaries. The Commissioner or his
6464 designee shall develop an intraagency career ladder program, one
6565 part of which shall be the intraagency posting of all nonentry level
6666 positions for at least ten (10) days before any public posting. The
6767 Commissioner or his designee shall develop a system of annual
6868 performance evaluations based on measurable job tasks. All merit
6969 pay for Board employees must be based on the system established
7070 under this section.
7171 SECTION 4. Subsection C, Section 2-3, The Securities Act
7272 (Article 581-2-3, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to
7373 read as follows:
7474 C. A person appointed to the Board is entitled to
7575 reimbursement[, as provided by the General Appropriations Act,] for
7676 the travel expenses incurred in attending the training program
7777 regardless of whether the attendance at the program occurs before
7878 or after the person qualifies for office.
7979 SECTION 5. Subsections A and D, Section 35, The Securities
8080 Act (Article 581-35, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to
8181 read as follows:
8282 A. The Board shall establish the following fees to produce
8383 [in amounts so that the aggregate amount that exceeds the amount of
8484 the fees on September 1, 2002, produces] sufficient revenue to
8585 cover the costs of administering and enforcing this Act:
8686 (1) for the filing of any original, amended, or
8787 renewal application to sell or dispose of securities[, an amount
8888 not to exceed $100];
8989 (2) for the filing of any original application of a
9090 dealer or investment adviser or for the submission of a notice
9191 filing for a federal covered investment adviser[, an amount not to
9292 exceed $100];
9393 (3) for the filing of any renewal application of a
9494 dealer or investment adviser or for the submission of a renewal
9595 notice filing for a federal covered investment adviser[, an amount
9696 not to exceed $100];
9797 (4) for the filing of any original application for
9898 each agent, officer, or investment adviser representative or for
9999 the submission of a notice filing for each representative of a
100100 federal covered investment adviser[, an amount not to exceed $100];
101101 and
102102 (5) for the filing of any renewal application for each
103103 agent, officer, or investment adviser representative or for the
104104 submission of a renewal notice filing for each representative of a
105105 federal covered investment adviser[, an amount not to exceed $100].
106106 D. A cost incurred by the Board in administering or
107107 enforcing this Act may be paid only from a fee collected under
108108 Subsection A of this section.
109109 SECTION 6. The following provisions of The Securities Act
110110 (Article 581-l et seq., Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes) are
111111 repealed:
112112 (1) Subsections J, M, and N, Section 2;
113113 (2) Subsection C, Section 35; and
114114 (3) Section 36.
115115 SECTION 7. Subject to Chapter 472, Government Code, the
116116 appropriations made by an Act of the 84th Legislature, Regular
117117 Session, 2015, may be spent by the State Securities Board as the
118118 Securities Commissioner directs. The board shall repay to the
119119 general revenue fund the appropriation made to the agency for the
120120 state fiscal year ending August 31, 2016, not later than that date
121121 and as funds become available. The board shall repay to the general
122122 revenue fund the appropriation made to the board for the state
123123 fiscal year ending August 31, 2017, not later than that date and as
124124 funds become available.
125125 SECTION 8. The transfer of the State Securities Board to
126126 self-directed and semi-independent status under this Act, and the
127127 expiration of self-directed and semi-independent status may not act
128128 to cancel, suspend, or prevent:
129129 (1) any debt owed to or by the State Securities Board;
130130 (2) any fine, tax, penalty, or obligation of any
131131 party;
132132 (3) any contract or other obligation of any party; or
133133 (4) any action taken by the State Securities Board,
134134 the Securities Commissioner, or the board's employees in the
135135 administration or enforcement of the agency's duties.
136136 SECTION 9. The State Securities Board shall continue to
137137 have and exercise the powers and duties allocated to the board in
138138 the board's enabling legislation, except as specifically amended by
139139 this Act.
140140 SECTION 10. Title to or ownership of all supplies,
141141 materials, records, equipment, books, papers, and furniture used by
142142 the State Securities Board is transferred to the State Securities
143143 Board in fee simple. This Act does not affect any property owned by
144144 the State Securities Board on or before the effective date of this
145145 Act.
146146 SECTION 11. Beginning September 1, 2015, the State
147147 Securities Board shall pay rent to this state in a reasonable amount
148148 to be determined by the Texas Facilities Commission for its use and
149149 occupancy of state-owned office space.
150150 SECTION 12. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
151151 * * * * *