Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2438
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3614
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1145
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|