Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 6, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 17, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2015
Bill April 28, 2015