Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1311 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#530 | Journal Page: 2358 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2303 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2303 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2303 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 728 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 728 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |