E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|