1 | | - | By: Frank, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2655 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | | - | and Human Services; May 21, 2015, rereferred to Committee on |
---|
5 | | - | Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by |
---|
6 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to |
---|
7 | | - | printer.) |
---|
8 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2655 |
---|
12 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 5 | | relating to requiring the Department of Family and Protective |
---|
14 | 6 | | Services to study the effectiveness of the relative and other |
---|
15 | 7 | | designated caregiver placement program. |
---|
16 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
17 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 264, Family Code, is |
---|
18 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 264.761 to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 11 | | Sec. 264.761. STUDY OF PROGRAM. (a) The department shall |
---|
20 | 12 | | study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated |
---|
21 | 13 | | caregiver placement program created by this subchapter and make |
---|
22 | 14 | | recommendations to the legislature for improving the program. The |
---|
23 | 15 | | recommended improvements must be designed to minimize the number of |
---|
24 | 16 | | placements for each child, maximize efficiency in the distribution |
---|
25 | 17 | | of any monetary or other assistance for which caregivers qualify, |
---|
26 | 18 | | facilitate a safe and permanent exit from the managing |
---|
27 | 19 | | conservatorship of the department in as timely a fashion as |
---|
28 | 20 | | possible, and assist caregivers in obtaining the verification |
---|
29 | 21 | | necessary to qualify for foster care maintenance reimbursement. |
---|
30 | 22 | | The recommendations may include increases in the amount of |
---|
31 | 23 | | assistance and the identification of automated or other processes |
---|
32 | 24 | | designed to speed the payment of assistance. |
---|
33 | 25 | | (b) The department shall report its findings and |
---|
34 | 26 | | recommendations to the legislature not later than January 1, 2017. |
---|
35 | 27 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2017. |
---|
36 | 28 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
37 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 29 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 30 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 31 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2655 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
| 32 | + | 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 33 | + | voting. |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 36 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2655 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 37 | + | 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 40 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Date |
---|
| 42 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Governor |
---|