Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2655 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frank, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2655
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 21, 2015, rereferred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Department of Family and Protective
 Services to study the effectiveness of the relative and other
 designated caregiver placement program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.761 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.761.  STUDY OF PROGRAM.  (a)  The department shall
 study the effectiveness of the relative and other designated
 caregiver placement program created by this subchapter and make
 recommendations to the legislature for improving the program.  The
 recommended improvements must be designed to minimize the number of
 placements for each child, maximize efficiency in the distribution
 of any monetary or other assistance for which caregivers qualify,
 facilitate a safe and permanent exit from the managing
 conservatorship of the department in as timely a fashion as
 possible, and assist caregivers in obtaining the verification
 necessary to qualify for foster care maintenance reimbursement.
 The recommendations may include increases in the amount of
 assistance and the identification of automated or other processes
 designed to speed the payment of assistance.
 (b)  The department shall report its findings and
 recommendations to the legislature not later than January 1, 2017.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *